Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Kaniecki, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1935Born
5 Jun 196530.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Mar 198448.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
1 May 198449.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
1 Jun 198550.1SucceededBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
28 Jul 198550.2InstalledBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
6 Aug 200065.3DiedBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Kaniecki
Bishop Michael Joseph Kaniecki S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Fairbanks

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit, MI

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast