Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Karl Joseph Cardinal Schulte

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1871BornValbert
22 Mar 189523.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
30 Nov 190938.2SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
7 Feb 191038.3ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Mar 191038.5Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
8 Mar 192048.4AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Mar 192048.5InstalledArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
7 Mar 192149.4Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 192149.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
11 Mar 194169.4DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Joseph Schulte:
Karl Joseph Cardinal Schulte (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
  • a cardinal for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015