Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Poggenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Archbishop of Nicopsis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1862Born
15 Jun 188927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
7 May 191350.9SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
4 Jul 191351.1ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
16 Oct 191351.4Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
29 Aug 193068.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopsis
6 Jan 193370.6DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Poggenburg
Archbishop Johannes Poggenburg (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstbevern

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast