Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hubert Theophil Simar

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1835Born
1 Sep 185822.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
2 May 185923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Jun 189155.5SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
17 Dec 189156.0ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
25 Feb 189256.1Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
24 Oct 189963.8SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Dec 189964.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
20 Feb 190064.1InstalledArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 May 190266.4DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hubert Theophil Simar (VIAF: 62324867)
Archbishop Hubert Theophil Simar (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEupen, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paderborn, Diocese of Paderborn

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 215, and Page 435
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017