Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Stoffels

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1879Born
28 Mar 190323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
11 Nov 192243.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
11 Nov 192243.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
17 Dec 192243.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
17 Oct 192344.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Stoffels
Bishop Josef Stoffels (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDuisburg-Ruhrort

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018