Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Clemens August Cardinal von Galen

Deceased

Bishop of Münster

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1878BornDinklage en Oldenburg
28 May 190426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
5 Sep 193355.5AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
28 Oct 193355.6Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
18 Feb 194667.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194667.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
22 Mar 194668.0DiedBishop of Münster, Germany
9 Oct 2005Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Clemens August von Galen:
Cardinal Bl. Clemens August von Galen (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
  • a cardinal for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013