Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Vogt

Deceased

Bishop of Aachen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1865BornSchmidt bei Monschau
19 Aug 188822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
10 Dec 193065.3SelectedBishop of Aachen, Germany
30 Jan 193165.4ConfirmedBishop of Aachen, Germany
19 Mar 193165.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aachen, Germany
25 Mar 193165.5InstalledBishop of Aachen, Germany
5 Oct 193772.1DiedBishop of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vogt:
Bishop Joseph Vogt (born , died ) Bishop of Aachen

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013