Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Lörks, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central New Guinea

Titular Bishop of Medeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1876BornHanselaer, Germany
28 Jan 191033.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
19 Jun 192852.2AppointedPrefect of Central New Guinea
22 Aug 193155.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Central New Guinea
23 May 193357.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Medeli
23 May 193357.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central New Guinea
17 Dec 193357.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medeli
15 Mar 194569.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Central New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lörks:
Bishop Joseph Lörks S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central New Guinea

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013