Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Jakob Dingelstad

Deceased

Bishop of Münster, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1835Born
22 Jun 185924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
15 Aug 188954.4SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
30 Dec 188954.8ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
24 Feb 189054.9Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
6 Mar 191176.0DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann Jakob Dingelstad (VIAF: 67209267)
Bishop Hermann Jakob Dingelstad (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBracht, Diocese of Münster
Ordained BishopCathedral, Münster, Diocese of Münster

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017