Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Hähling von Lanzenauer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Delcus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1861Born
10 Aug 188322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
5 Aug 191251.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
5 Aug 191251.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Delcus
24 Oct 191251.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Delcus
30 Aug 192564.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Hähling von Lanzenauer
Bishop Heinrich Hähling von Lanzenauer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoblenz

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast