Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Maria Heinrich Rintelen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Chusira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1899BornAhlen
13 Jan 192424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
12 Dec 195152.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
12 Dec 195152.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chusira
24 Jan 195252.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chusira
29 Jul 197070.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
9 Nov 198888.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Maria Heinrich Rintelen:
Bishop Friedrich Maria Heinrich Rintelen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c34: CB, 25 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013