Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Friedrich Reinelt

Bishop Emeritus of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1936 BornNeurode
29 Jun 196124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
2 Jan 198851.2AppointedBishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany
20 Feb 198851.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany
20 Feb 201275.3RetiredBishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Joachim Friedrich Reinelt:
Bishop Joachim Friedrich Reinelt (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,528
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013