Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Clément Victor Donze

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1912BornNotre-Dame-de-Lourdes, Canada
19 Sep 193623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
15 Nov 196250.0AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
26 Jan 196350.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
12 Feb 197057.3AppointedBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
25 Mar 198875.4RetiredBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
25 Jun 200289.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Clément Victor Donze:
Bishop Henri Clément Victor Donze (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 18 May 2015