Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raymond Joseph Louis Bouchex

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1927BornLugrin
3 Jun 195023.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 197245.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
23 Feb 197245.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Elvas
19 Mar 197245.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elvas
25 Apr 197851.3AppointedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
21 Jun 200275.4RetiredArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
9 May 201083.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France

MicroData Summary for Raymond Joseph Louis Bouchex:
Archbishop Raymond Joseph Louis Bouchex (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013