Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain Harel

Bishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1950 Born
3 Sep 197828.1Ordained PriestPriest of Port-Louis, Mauritius
31 Oct 200252.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Rodrigues, Mauritius
31 Oct 200252.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Forconium
8 Dec 200252.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forconium
10 Sep 202070.2AppointedBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles

MicroData Summary for Alain Harel
Bishop Alain Harel (born ) Bishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuatre Bornes
Ordained BishopSaint-Gabriel, Church, Port-Mathurin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port Victoria o Seychelles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,287
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 10 Sep 2020

Quantcast