Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphaël Balla Guilavogui

Bishop of N’Zérékoré


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1964 BornWoleme
14 Nov 199329.1Ordained PriestPriest of N’Zérékoré, Guinea
14 Aug 200843.9AppointedBishop of N’Zérékoré, Guinea
13 Dec 200844.2Ordained BishopBishop of N’Zérékoré, Guinea

MicroData Summary for Raphaël Balla Guilavogui:
Bishop Raphaël Balla Guilavogui (born ) Bishop of N’Zérékoré

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of N’Zérékoré.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,997

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013