Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrés Carrascosa Coso

Apostolic Nuncio to Panama

Titular Archbishop of Elo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1955 BornCuenca, Spain
2 Jul 198024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cuenca, Spain
31 Jul 200448.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Elo
31 Jul 200448.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
26 Aug 200448.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gabon
7 Oct 200448.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Elo
12 Jan 200953.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama

MicroData Summary for Andrés Carrascosa Coso:
Archbishop Andrés Carrascosa Coso (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Panama

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Panama.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,702
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013