Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Joseph-Judith-François-Xavier de Sagey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1759BornOrnans
12 Feb 182363.9SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
10 Mar 182363.9ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
1 May 182364.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
13 Jul 182465.3ResignedBishop of Tulle, France
20 Mar 183677.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Joseph-Judith-François-Xavier de Sagey:
Bishop Claude-Joseph-Judith-François-Xavier de Sagey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013