Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe-Marie-Thérèse-Guy Carron

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1788Born
19 Dec 181224.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 182940.3SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
28 Sep 182940.7ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
8 Nov 182940.9Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
27 Aug 183344.7DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe-Marie-Thérèse-Guy Carron
Bishop Philippe-Marie-Thérèse-Guy Carron (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRennes

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,829, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast