Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Torres y Torres

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1849Born
7 Jun 187324.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 191364.2AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
14 Dec 191364.6Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
4 Jul 191465.2DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Torres y Torres (VIAF: 106990103)
Bishop Manuel Torres y Torres (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 72
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,730

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022