Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eustaquio Cardinal Ilundáin y Esteban

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1862Born
10 Apr 188623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pamplona, Spain
14 Nov 190442.1AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
13 Mar 190542.4Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
16 Dec 192058.2AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
30 Mar 192562.5Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 192563.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
10 Aug 193774.8DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Eustaquio Ilundáin y Esteban
Eustaquio Cardinal Ilundáin y Esteban (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
  • a cardinal for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast