Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Álvaro y Ballano

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1876BornCimballa
3 Jun 191337.3SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
9 Jul 191337.4ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
9 Jul 191337.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
7 Dec 191337.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
25 May 191438.3AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
31 Dec 192751.9DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Álvaro y Ballano:
Bishop Antonio Álvaro y Ballano (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 70
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013