Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Baztán y Urniza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oviedo

Titular Bishop of Nilopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1844BornSada
13 Mar 186924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Pamplona, Spain
14 Nov 190460.5AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
13 Mar 190560.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
18 Oct 192076.5RetiredBishop of Oviedo, Spain
18 Oct 192076.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
14 Dec 192682.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Baztán y Urniza:
Bishop Francisco Javier Baztán y Urniza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oviedo

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 283
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013