Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Basulto y Jiménez

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1869Born
15 Mar 189323.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 190940.2AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
16 Jan 191040.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
18 Dec 191950.5AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
12 Aug 193667.2DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Basulto y Jiménez
Bishop Manuel Basulto y Jiménez (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdanero

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast