Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrique Cardinal Reig y Casanova

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1859BornValencia
1886¹26.9Ordained PriestPriest of Almería, Spain
23 Apr 191455.3SelectedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
28 May 191455.4ConfirmedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
8 Nov 191455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
22 Apr 192061.3AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
11 Dec 192263.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 192263.9AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
25 May 192364.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
25 Aug 192768.6DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Reig y Casanova:
Cardinal Enrique Reig y Casanova (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
  • a cardinal for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 62
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 80, and Page 386

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013