Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Pérez y Muñoz

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1864BornSoto de Campóo, Spain
17 Sep 188824.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 190944.8AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
3 Oct 190945.2Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
18 Jul 191349.0AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
11 Jul 192056.0AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
24 Oct 192056.3InstalledBishop of Córdoba, Spain
21 Dec 194581.4DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Pérez y Muñoz:
Bishop Adolfo Pérez y Muñoz (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013