Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrej Glavan

Bishop of Novo Mesto, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1943 Born
29 Jun 197228.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
13 May 200056.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
13 May 200056.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti in Numidia
12 Jun 200056.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti in Numidia
26 Apr 200460.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ljubljana, Slovenia
5 Dec 200461.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ljubljana, Slovenia
7 Apr 200662.4AppointedBishop of Novo Mesto, Slovenia
31 Jul 201369.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ljubljana, Slovenia
23 Nov 201471.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Andrej Glavan
Bishop Andrej Glavan (born ) Bishop of Novo Mesto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoteska in Novo Mesto
Ordained BishopSaint Nicolas, Cathedral, Ljubljana, Archdiocese of Ljubljana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Novo Mesto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,783
  • aadm: CB, 17 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 9 Aug 2020

Quantcast