Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alojzij Šuštar

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1920Born
27 Oct 194625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
23 Feb 198059.2AppointedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
13 Apr 198059.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
5 Mar 199776.3RetiredArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
29 Jun 200786.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Alojzij Šuštar
Archbishop Alojzij Šuštar (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrebnje

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018