Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico dal Covolo, S.D.B.

Rector of the Pontifical Lateran University

Titular Bishop of Heraclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1950 BornFeltre, Italy
2 Oct 197323.0ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Dec 197929.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Jun 201059.7AppointedRector of the Pontifical Lateran University
15 Sep 201059.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea
9 Oct 201060.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea

MicroData Summary for Enrico dal Covolo:
Bishop Enrico dal Covolo S.D.B. (born ) Rector of Pontifical Lateran University

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Lateran University.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,857

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013