Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Beograd (-Smederevo)

Archidioecesis Belogradensis (-Semendriensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stanislav Hočevar, S.D.B., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 October 1924
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Serbia
  • Square Kilometers: 50,000 (19,312 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Nadbiskupski Ordinarijat, Svetozara Markovica 20, 11000 Beograd, Srbija
  • Telephone: (011)303.22.46
  • Fax: 303.22.48

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Beograd {Belgrade}
9th CenturyErectedDiocese of Beograd {Belgrade} (erected)
Diocese of Beograd (-Smederevo)
23 December 1729UnitedDiocese of Beograd {Belgrade}
Diocese of Smederevo (Semendria)
Diocese of Beograd (-Smederevo)
Archdiocese of Beograd (-Smederevo)
29 October 1924ElevatedDiocese of Beograd (-Smederevo) Archdiocese of Beograd (-Smederevo)
16 December 1986ElevatedArchdiocese of Beograd (-Smederevo) (became a Metroplitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Beograd (-Smederevo)
195050,0003,500,0001.4%1013232,173734815ap1951
195950,0003,200,0001.6%914232,1732017015ap1960
196936,0005,000,000.7%1019291,2412439511ap1971
198034,8005,000,000.7%97162,1751518413ap1981
199012,4005,590,000.2%1215274591714615ap1991
19998,4005,505,000.2%91019442114215ap2000
20008,3005,500,000.2%1081846193415ap2001
20019,0005,500,000.2%101020450123915ap2002
20029,8005,599,800.2%121022445123315ap2003
20039,9005,647,900.2%111122450133515ap2004
200460,0005,527,8101.1%149232,60893015ap2005
20069,2675,469,977.2%1492340292716ap2007
201226,1305,938,000.4%119201,30691516ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013