Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanislav Hočevar, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1945 Born
29 Jun 197327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Mar 200054.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
24 May 200054.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
31 Mar 200155.3SucceededArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

MicroData Summary for Stanislav Hočevar
Archbishop Stanislav Hočevar S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJelendol in Novo Mesto

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Beograd (-Smederevo).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,772

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast