Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Jamnik

Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

Titular Bishop of Vina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1961 Born
29 Jun 198725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
15 Nov 200544.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
15 Nov 200544.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vina
8 Jan 200644.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vina

MicroData Summary for Anton Jamnik
Bishop Anton Jamnik (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVidem-Dobrepolje

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Ljubljana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,026

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast