Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariusz Leszczyński

Auxiliary Bishop of Zamość-Lubaczów, Poland

Titular Bishop of Bassiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1957 Born
19 Mar 198325.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv, Ukraine
28 Jun 198326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
3 Jun 199134.1IncardinatedPriest of Lubaczów, Poland
10 Jun 199841.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zamość-Lubaczów, Poland
10 Jun 199841.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bassiana
4 Jul 199841.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bassiana

MicroData Summary for Mariusz Leszczyński
Bishop Mariusz Leszczyński (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zamość-Lubaczów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHoryniec Zdrój

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zamość-Lubaczów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,353
  • opd: CB, 11 Feb 2016
  • od/c0: CB, 4 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast