Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Buczek

Bishop Emeritus of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1953 BornCieszanów, Poland
16 Jun 197926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
4 May 200249.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
4 May 200249.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Febiana
20 Jun 200249.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Febiana
16 Jul 200754.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
19 Mar 200956.0SucceededBishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
16 May 200956.2InstalledBishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
12 Apr 201461.1ResignedBishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Marian Buczek:
Bishop Marian Buczek (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,203
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Apr 2014