Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Antsiranana

Archidioecesis Antsirananensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Benjamin Marc Balthason Ramaroson, C.M., Archbishop
  • Michel Malo, Ist. del Prado, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 28 October 1989
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 37,924 (14,648 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 5 Boulevard le Myre de Villers, B.P. 415, Antsiranana 201, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (020)82.21.605; (032)04.748.23

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Madagascar {Madagascar Settentrionale}
16 January 1896ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Madagascar Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Madagascar {Madagascar Settentrionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez
20 May 1913Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Madagascar {Madagascar Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez
15 March 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez Vicariate Apostolic of Majunga (erected)
Diocese of Diégo-Suarez
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez Diocese of Diégo-Suarez
Archdiocese of Diégo-Suarez
11 December 1958ElevatedDiocese of Diégo-Suarez Archdiocese of Diégo-Suarez
21 May 1959Territory LostArchdiocese of Diégo-Suarez
Archdiocese of Tananarive
Diocese of Ambatondrazaka (erected)
Archdiocese of Antsiranana
28 October 1989Name ChangedArchdiocese of Diégo-Suarez Archdiocese of Antsiranana
30 October 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Antsiranana Diocese of Fenoarivo Atsinanana (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez
194936,948541,3346.8%741487694164ap1951
Diocese of Diégo-Suarez
Archdiocese of Diégo-Suarez
197076,898813,2279.5%141421,83064873ap1971
1980104,2321,110,0009.4%2129502,084499420ap1981
Archdiocese of Antsiranana
1990194,3551,665,00011.7%2325484,0496811121ap1991
1999340,7762,468,46613.8%4415595,7755214822ap2000
2000231,0001,780,04013.0%3330633,6666514416ap2001
2001231,0001,780,04013.0%5014643,6094218516ap2002
2002310,1331,566,16219.8%2910397,9524211617ap2003
2003312,1402,010,73615.5%3812506,2423511717ap2004
2004343,3542,211,80915.5%3610467,4644011917ap2005
2006369,7571,209,60030.6%3311448,4034415023ap2007
2012590,7961,431,00041.3%4520659,0894213925ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 27 Nov 2013