Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Samuel Raobelina, M.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tsiroanomandidy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1928BornAmbositra
21 Mar 195930.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
27 Apr 197849.8AppointedBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar
9 Jul 197850.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar
30 Jun 200173.0DiedBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean-Samuel Raobelina:
Bishop Jean-Samuel Raobelina M.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Tsiroanomandidy

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013