Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Remy Rakotonirina, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Farafangana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1928BornFianarantsoa
6 Sep 196133.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 Oct 197648.8AppointedBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar
27 Mar 197749.2Ordained BishopBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar
6 Aug 200577.6DiedBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Charles-Remy Rakotonirina:
Bishop Charles-Remy Rakotonirina S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Farafangana

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014