Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Maria Rakotondrasoa, M.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antsirabé, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1914Born
11 Apr 193925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
28 Feb 197460.0AppointedBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
12 May 197460.2Ordained BishopBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
19 Jun 198975.3RetiredBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
24 Aug 200288.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Antsirabé, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean-Maria Rakotondrasoa
Bishop Jean-Maria Rakotondrasoa M.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antsirabé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBétafo
Ordained BishopAntsirabé, Diocese of Antsirabé

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast