Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Joseph Leo Pelletier, M.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Morondava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1931 BornAttleboro, MA, USA
28 Oct 195625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
15 Oct 199968.3AppointedBishop of Morondava, Madagascar
13 Feb 200068.7Ordained BishopBishop of Morondava, Madagascar
26 Feb 201078.7RetiredBishop of Morondava, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Donald Joseph Leo Pelletier:
Bishop Donald Joseph Leo Pelletier M.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Morondava

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Morondava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,697

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013