Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fulgence Razakarivony, M.S.

Bishop of Ihosy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1963 BornBetsiholany
19 Sep 198522.1ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
1990²26.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
8 Aug 199330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
16 Jul 201147.9AppointedBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar
6 Nov 201148.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fulgence Razakarivony:
Bishop Fulgence Razakarivony M.S. (born ) Bishop of Ihosy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ihosy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2011
  • ob: CB, 27 Sep 2011
  • c2+: CB, 5 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013