Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco d’Errico

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alghero

Titular Archbishop of Samosata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1862BornCastel Baronia
20 Sep 188422.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 191452.3AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
25 Oct 191452.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
7 Mar 191552.8InstalledBishop of Alghero, Italy
8 Oct 193876.3ResignedBishop of Alghero, Italy
8 Oct 193876.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Samosata
31 Oct 1957³95.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Alghero, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco d’Errico:
Archbishop Francesco d’Errico (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alghero

  • a priest for 73.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 46
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013