Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Ciuchini, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alghero, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1881Born
1896²14.9EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
14 Apr 189716.2Simple VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
16 Sep 190322.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
28 Oct 190423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
3 Mar 193958.1AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
23 Apr 193958.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
7 Jan 196785.9RetiredBishop of Alghero, Italy
7 Jan 196785.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Selendeta
3 Dec 197089.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Selendeta
11 Feb 197594.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Alghero, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Ciuchini
Bishop Adolfo Ciuchini O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alghero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGradoli

  • a priest for 70.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,939, Number 16
  • qodm: CB, 19 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast