Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Gamba

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1857BornSan Damiano d’Asti
18 Sep 188023.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 190144.6AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
23 Feb 190244.8Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
13 Aug 190649.3AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
20 Dec 192366.7AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
20 Dec 192669.7Elevated to Cardinal
23 Dec 192669.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
26 Dec 192972.7DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gamba:
Cardinal Giuseppe Gamba (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 162
  • c34: CB, 21 Feb 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013