Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giuseppe Schillaci

Bishop-Elect of Lamezia Terme, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1958 Born
28 Dec 198628.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Catania, Italy
4 Jul 198729.4Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
3 May 201961.3AppointedBishop of Lamezia Terme, Italy
6 Jul 201961.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lamezia Terme, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Schillaci (VIAF: 19218466)
Father Giuseppe Schillaci (born ) Bishop-Elect of Lamezia Terme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdrano, Archdiocese of Catania
Ordained BishopSanti Pietro e Paolo, Cathedral, Lamezia Terme, Diocese of Lamezia Terme

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Lamezia Terme.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 May 2019
  • od/c1: CB, 3 May 2019
  • c2: CB, 16 May 2019
  • ob/c3: CB, 20 May 2019
  • c34: CB, 28 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 30 May 2019

Quantcast