Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Rosario Mennonna

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nard˛, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1906Born
12 Aug 192822.2Ordained PriestPriest of Muro Lucano, Italy
5 Jan 195548.6AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
13 Mar 195548.7Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
22 Feb 196255.7AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
30 Sep 198377.3RetiredBishop of Nard˛, Italy
6 Nov 2009103.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Nard˛, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Rosario Mennonna
Bishop Antonio Rosario Mennonna (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nard˛

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuro Lucano

  • a priest for 81.2 years
  • a bishop for 54.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1955, Number 14
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 May 2018

Quantcast