Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Costanzo

Archbishop Emeritus of Siracusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1933 BornCarruba di Riposto
15 Aug 195522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
21 Feb 197643.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Acireale, Italy
21 Feb 197643.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mazaca
4 Apr 197643.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mazaca
17 Nov 197946.9AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
6 Aug 198249.6AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
7 Dec 198956.9AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
12 Sep 200875.7RetiredArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Costanzo:
Archbishop Giuseppe Costanzo (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Siracusa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Siracusa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013