Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Manzella

Bishop Emeritus of Cefal¨, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1942 Born
1 Jul 196724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
30 Apr 199148.4AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
29 Jun 199148.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
17 Sep 200966.8AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
16 Feb 201875.2RetiredBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Manzella
Bishop Vincenzo Manzella (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cefal¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasteldaccia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cefal¨.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Sep 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,602
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast