Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosario Mazzola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cefalý, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1924Born
16 Jul 195025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
19 Jun 198257.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
19 Jun 198257.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Polymartium
4 Sep 198257.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polymartium
23 Jul 198863.8AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
18 Mar 200075.4RetiredBishop of Cefalý, Italy
24 Dec 201894.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cefalý, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rosario Mazzola
Bishop Rosario Mazzola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cefalý

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopSte. Marie, Church, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Death PlaceCefalý, Diocese of Cefalý
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Cefalý, Diocese of Cefalý

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 24 Dec 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast