Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Riboldi, I.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acerra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1923Born
29 Jun 195128.4Ordained PriestPriest of Institute of Charity
25 Jan 197855.0AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
11 Mar 197855.1Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
7 Dec 199976.8RetiredBishop of Acerra, Italy
10 Dec 201794.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Acerra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Riboldi (VIAF: 77713696)
Bishop Antonio Riboldi I.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acerra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTriuggio
Death PlaceStresa

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 10 Dec 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast