Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Donatus Djagom, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ende, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1919Born
28 Aug 194930.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
19 Dec 196849.6AppointedArchbishop of Endeh, Indonesia
11 Jun 196950.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Endeh, Indonesia
23 Feb 199676.7RetiredArchbishop of Ende, Indonesia
29 Nov 201192.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ende, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Donatus Djagom
Archbishop Donatus Djagom S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilas

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Nov 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Oct 2017